skip to content

Swan, Elizabeth Catherine

CPSO#: 24977

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 87 Kerr's Lane, Brantford, ON N3T 5L8
Date Received: 26 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015