skip to content

Swaminathan, Aparna

CPSO#: 90336

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tamil

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: 705-526-1300 Ext. 1501 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
Paediatric School Outreach Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-393-1279 Ext. 20042
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Milton District Hospital
Emergency Department
725 Bronte St South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Canada
Phone: 905-876-7606
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Aparna Swaminathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Swaminathan ( CPSO# 90336 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
Emergency Department
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2083

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 393-1279


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. APARNA SWAMINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAMINATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009