skip to content

Swain, John Richard

CPSO#: 22551

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Swain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2010
Corporation Name: John Richard Swain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 17 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Glarier Medical Centre 11 Gibb Street Oshawa, Ontario L1H 2J9
Date Received: 01 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012