Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 30 Apr 1992
Summary:
On April 30, 1992, The Fitness to Practise Committee finds that Dr. Swackhammer is an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to clause 62(1)(b) of the Health Disciplines Act.
The Fitness to Practise Committee orders the following as terms and conditions of Dr. Swackhammer s licence:
1. that he engage in the practice of medicine in association with another health care professional acceptable to the Registrar who shall monitor and file yearly reports to the College;
2. that he regularly see a physician familiar with the treatment of substance abuse acceptable to the Registrar and who shall monitor and file quarterly reports to the College;
3. that should any person who has executed an acknowledgement and undertaking for Dr. Swackhammer pursuant to the order of the Fitness to Practise Committee be unable or unwilling to continue under the terms of the acknowledgement and undertaking, Dr. Swackhammer will provide, within thirty days, a fresh acknowledgement and undertaking from a similarly qualified person who is satisfactory to the Registrar;
4. that he abstain totally from the consumption of narcotics or controlled drugs or their preparations unless prescribed by his treating physician;
5. that he not possess or prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs or their preparations. However, Dr. Swackhammer may prescribe these drugs to his patients admitted to a public hospital if the drugs are administered by someone else.
6. that if Dr. Swackhammer is unable or unwilling to comply with any provision of this order, he shall cease practising until he can once again bring himself into full compliance with the order.
A subsequent order was made by the Fitness to Practise Committee to delete the condition appearing in paragraph 5 and replace it with the following:
5. Dr. Warren B. Swackhammer is permitted to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs or their preparations, provided that he complete the course Prescribing Narcotics and Controlled Drugs offered by the University of Toronto by December 31, 1997.
Should Dr. Swackhammer fail to complete the course as required, he shall not prescribe narcotics, or controlled drugs or their preparations.
On June 29, 2000, the Fitness to Practice Committee directed the Registrar to remove the terms, conditions and limitations imposed on Dr. Warren B. Swackhammer s Certificate of Registration by Order dated April 30, 1992 and amended by Order dated November 21, 1996.
Appeal: No Appeal