skip to content

Beauchemin, Suzanne Marie

CPSO#: 55439

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Oct 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 May 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 26 May 2021
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 26 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2021 Active
 As from May 25, 2021, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Suzanne Marie Beauchemin: 

a. Dr. Beauchemin shall comply with the College Policy "Closing a Medical Practice";

b. Dr. Beauchemin shall comply with all outstanding requirements of the Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program directed by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in its decision of December 14, 2017, including the outstanding reassessment of her practice to occur approximately six (6) months after she resumes practice following the suspension of her certificate of registration;

c. Dr. Beauchemin shall successfully complete, at her own expense, individualized instruction in time management and organization with an education consultant approved by the College, and provide proof thereof to the College within six (6) months of the date of this Order;

d. Dr. Beauchemin will attend, at minimum, one (1) meeting per month with a psychiatrist who is acceptable to the College, for as long as the psychiatrist deems necessary, but for not less than a two (2) year period from the date of this Order. For a period of two (2) years from the date of this Order, Dr. Beauchemin's psychiatrist will provide monthly reports attesting to Dr. Beauchemin's attendance at these regularly scheduled meetings; and

e. Dr. Beauchemin shall maintain a Log of all requests for chart transfers, all requests for completion of forms and all requests for medication refills made outside of a clinical appointment for an indefinite period of time ("the Log"). The Log shall indicate when such requests were made and when they were fulfilled, and Dr. Beauchemin shall submit this Log to the College on a monthly basis. For greater clarity, Dr. Beauchemin shall maintain this log and submit it to the College including but not limited to during the time that her certificate of registration is suspended.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 May 2021
Summary:

On May 25, 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via videoconference, 
 an allegation of Dr. Beauchemin’s professional misconduct. The College’s Inquiries, 
 Complaints and Reports Committee (ICRC) had required Dr. Beauchemin to complete a 
specified continuing education or remediation program (SCERP). Dr. Beauchemin failed 
to comply with certain elements of the SCERP in that she failed to meet with a clinical 
 supervisor the required number of times. The reassessment required under the SCERP 
 has not taken place. In 2019, Dr. Beauchemin failed to attend and rescheduled several 
 appointments with a patient and terminated their physician-patient relationship in a 
 manner that did not comply with College policy. The patient complained to the College. 
 Dr. Beauchemin did not respond to the College’s requests for a response and for the 
 patient’s records. Dr. Beauchemin failed to maintain a complete and comprehensive 
 chart for the patient.  
  
 The hearing proceeded in the presence of Dr. Beauchemin and her counsel, and counsel 
for the College. On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability), 
 the Committee found that Dr. Beauchemin committed an act of professional 
misconduct under: 

   -  paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 
      1991, in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
      medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
      regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Disposition 
 
Taking into account an Agreed Statement of Facts (Penalty), the Discipline Committee 
ordered and directed that: 

   •  Dr. Beauchemin attend before the Committee to be reprimanded; 
   •  The Registrar suspend Dr. Beauchemin’s certificate of registration from May 26, 
      2021 at 12:01 a.m. until the later of:  
            a.    five (5) months after May 26, 2021 at 12:01 a.m.; or  
            b.    the date on which Dr. Beauchemin provides proof of her completion 
                  of the outstanding meetings with a Clinical Supervisor in 
                  accordance with the Specified Continuing Education and 
                  Remediation Program directed by the Inquiries, Complaints and 
                  Reports Committee in its decision of December 14, 2017;  
   •  The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
      Beauchemin’s certificate of registration effective immediately: 

          a. Dr. Beauchemin shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical 
             Practice”; 

          b. Dr. Beauchemin shall comply with all outstanding requirements of the 
            Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program directed by the 
            Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in its decision of December 
            14, 2017, including the outstanding reassessment of her practice to occur 
           approximately six (6) months after she resumes practice following the 
           suspension of her certificate of registration; 

         c. Dr. Beauchemin shall successfully complete, at her own expense, 
            individualized instruction in time management and organization with an 
            education consultant approved by the College, and provide proof thereof 
            to the College within six (6) months of the date of this Order; 

         d. Dr. Beauchemin will attend, at minimum, one (1) meeting per month with a 
            psychiatrist who is acceptable to the College, for as long as the 
            psychiatrist deems necessary, but for not less than a two (2) year period 
            from the date of this Order. For a period of two (2) years from the date of 
            this Order, Dr. Beauchemin’s psychiatrist will provide monthly reports 
            attesting to Dr. Beauchemin’s attendance at these regularly scheduled 
            meetings; and 

        e. Dr. Beauchemin shall maintain a Log of all requests for chart transfers, all 
           requests for completion of forms and all requests for medication refills 
           made outside of a clinical appointment for an indefinite period of time 
           (“the Log”). The Log shall indicate when such requests were made and 
           when they were fulfilled, and Dr. Beauchemin shall submit this Log to the 
           College on a monthly basis. For greater clarity, Dr. Beauchemin shall 
           maintain this log and submit it to the College including but not limited to 
           during the time that her certificate of registration is suspended. 

   •  Dr. Beauchemin pay costs to the College of $6,000. 
 
The Committee released its reasons for decision in this matter on June 18, 2021, and 
they are available via the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 25, 2021

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)