skip to content

Sutton, Allison Barbara

CPSO#: 86209

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Gelfer, Allison Barbara (used until: 29 Sep 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012