skip to content

Sutherland, Samuel David

CPSO#: 31820

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Feb 2021
EXPIRY DATE
03 Feb 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samuel Sutherland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sutherland ( CPSO# 31820 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (226) 343-2512

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:05 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Feb 2021