skip to content

Sutherland, Richard Ian Lloyd

CPSO#: 25904

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Aug 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Supervised Short Duration Practice as of 23 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2021