skip to content

Sutherland, Richard Ian Lloyd

CPSO#: 25904

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Mar 2021
EXPIRY DATE
07 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Supervised Short Duration Practice as of 23 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD IAN LLOYD SUTHERLAND may practise medicine only to the extent required by the appointment at UNDEFINDED YET for which the certificate is issued to Dr. SUTHERLAND;

(2) Dr. SUTHERLAND may practise medicine only under the supervision of the member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario who has given an undertaking to supervise Dr. SUTHERLAND and be responsible for providing continuing care for the patients attended by Dr. SUTHERLAND;

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following days:

(i) The day of expiry of the appointment referred to in clause (1),

(ii) The day Dr. SUTHERLAND leaves Ontario, or

(iii) The thirtieth day after the certificate is issued.

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is 07 Jul 2021.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2021
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jul 2021