skip to content

Sutherland, Lindsey Nicole

CPSO#: 101143

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone: (519) 352-3210
Fax: (519) 352-2176 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lindsey Sutherland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sutherland ( CPSO# 101143)

Business Address:
Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 354-5540

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 437-6050

Business Address:
325 Margaret Avenue
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2A7
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDSEY NICOLE SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015