skip to content

Sutherland, Kristiina Anne

CPSO#: 85886

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 409
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 222-7697 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. A. Sutherland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sutherland ( CPSO# 85886 )

Business Address:
Suite 409
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 222-7697

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTIINA ANNE SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2008 to 09 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2012