skip to content

Susini, Vincenzo Rocco

CPSO#: 97186

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
380 Elm St
Port Colborne ON  L3K 4P2 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

315 Ridge Road North
PO Box 400
Ridgeway ON  L0S 1N0
Canada
Phone: 289-876-9086
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

390 Crowland Ave
Welland ON  L3B 1X7
Canada
Phone: 289-876-9086
Fax: 833-478-1504
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Susini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Susini ( CPSO# 97186 )

Business Address:
380 Elm St
Port Colborne ON  L3K 4P2


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 20, 2019
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 11, 2019, West Nipissing General Hospital (WNGH) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.2(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that during the course of an external review by WNGH of Dr. Susini’s emergency medicine practice, Dr. Susini has ceased practising emergency medicine at WNGH effective June 20, 2019,

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 10 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 10 Jan 2020 Active
 As  from  January  10, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate  of  registration  held  by  Dr.  Vincenzo Rocco
            Susini in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Susini to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. VINCENZO ROCCO SUSINI
                                          ("Dr. Susini") 
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is  Schedule 2
                  to  the  Regulated  Health  Professions  Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline  Committee  of  the  College;
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public  Register" means the College's register that is available to  the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Susini,  certificate  of registration number 97186, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that  the  College  conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 1108978 (the "Investigation")  into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Susini, undertake to abide by the provisions  of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Susini, undertake that I will not engage  in the practice of
                        emergency medicine. I further undertake not to practise medicine in
                        any urgent care centre that is affiliated with a hospital.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Susini, undertake to inform the College of  each  and  every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited  to,  any hospitals, clinics, offices, institutions and any
                        Independent Health  Facilities  with  which I am affiliated, in any
                        jurisdiction  (collectively  my "Practice  Location"  or  "Practice
                        Locations"), within five (5) days  of  executing  this Undertaking.
                        Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
                        all  new  Practice  Locations  within  five (5) days of  commencing
                        practice at that location.

                  (b)   I, Dr. Susini, undertake that I will submit  to,  and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations  and patient
                        charts  by  a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Susini,  give  my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of  OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information,  in  order  for  the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr.  Susini, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP  consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I,  Dr.  Susini,  acknowledge  and  undertake  that  I  shall  be  solely
                  responsible for payment  of  all  fees,  costs,  charges,  expenses, etc.
                  arising  from  the  implementation  of  any  of  the  provisions of  this
                  Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived  my  right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,  at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr.  Susini,  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute  an  act  of  professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence,  and  may result in a referral of specified allegations  to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I,  Dr. Susini, acknowledge  that  this  Undertaking  constitutes  terms,
                  conditions,  and  limitations  on  my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that,  during  the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking  shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Susini, acknowledge that, in addition to this  Undertaking
                        being  posted   in  accordance  with  section  (13)(a)  above,  the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect: 
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Susini
                              engaged in  professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in
                              his  emergency   medicine   practice.  As  a  result  of  the
                              investigation,  Dr.  Susini  must   not   practise  emergency
                              medicine and must not work in any urgent care  centre that is
                              affiliated with a hospital.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Susini, give my irrevocable consent to the College to  provide all
                  Chiefs  of  Staff  with  any information the College has that led to  the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            The certificate of registration  held by Dr. Vincenzo Rocco Susini also carries
            the  following  term, condition and  limitation  imposed  by  the  Registration
            Committee, effective June 24, 2016.

            Dr.  Vincenzo Rocco  Susini  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
            medicine. 


Concerns

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: September 23, 2020
Summary: The following are disciplinary findings made by other regulatory bodies against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information: On September 23, 2020, the Disciplinary Subcommittee of the Michigan Board of Medicine found that Dr. Susini had violated the Michigan Public Health Code as a result of the adverse action taken by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (an undertaking entered into by Dr. Susini with CPSO in January 2020 which restricted his practice of medicine in Ontario) and by failing to notify the Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulation Affairs of such action. The Michigan Disciplinary Subcommittee ordered that Dr. Susini pay a fine of $2000 and not engage in the practice of medicine in the state of Michigan until he verifies that the Undertaking he entered into with CPSO has been removed from his Ontario medical license. The College was notified of this finding by a report from FSMB dated November 30, 2020.

 

Source: Member
Active Date: January 10, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vincenzo Rocco Susini to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 10, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Susini engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Susini must not practise emergency medicine and must not work in any urgent care centre that is affiliated with a hospital.