skip to content

Susil, Monica Hana

CPSO#: 89747

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Black Lake Road
Lively ON  P3Y 1J3
Phone: (705) 692-1018
Fax: (705) 692-7156 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: 705-523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. H. Susil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Susil ( CPSO# 89747 )

Business Address:
25 Black Lake Road
Lively ON  P3Y 1J3
Phone Number: (705) 692-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MONICA HANA SUSIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUSIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Aug 2008 to 16 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Nov 2008 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2010