skip to content

Surkont, Michael

CPSO#: 95164

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Morton Shulman Ave
North York ON  M3M 0B1 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Surkont Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. M. Surkont Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Surkont ( CPSO# 95164 )

Business Address:
23-3175 Rutherford Rd
Concord ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone Number: 905-761-1288


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SURKONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURKONT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013