skip to content

Surak, Aimann

CPSO#: 96380

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tichreen, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10240 Kingsway NW
Edmonton AB  T5H 3V9
Phone: 780-735-6870

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 07 Jul 2011 to 12 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Western University, 13 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
AVP - Pediatrics

Western University, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020