skip to content

Surajballi, Llewellyn

CPSO#: 97960

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Suite 101
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Llewellyn Surajballi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Surajballi ( CPSO# 97960 )

Business Address:
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Suite 101
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LLEWELLYN SURAJBALLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURAJBALLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014