skip to content

Suppiah, Subramanian Nagappan

CPSO#: 96648

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suppiah Clinical Endocrinology
358 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 1V7
Phone: 519-438-0002
Fax: 519-266-1200 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Hospital LHSC
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Niagara Region Medical
8279 Lundys Lane
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 1H5
Canada
Phone: 905-357-1661
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUBRAMANIAN NAGAPPAN SUPPIAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUPPIAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Aug 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2016