skip to content

Suppiah, Subramanian Nagappan

CPSO#: 96648

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suppiah Clinical Endocrinology
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 210
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-741-5252 Ext. 225
Fax: 519-266-1200 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: U Manian S Suppiah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Manian ( CPSO# 95317 )
Dr. S. Suppiah ( CPSO# 96648 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:02 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:24 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUBRAMANIAN NAGAPPAN SUPPIAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUPPIAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
EL - Infectious Diseases

Western University, 29 Aug 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2016