skip to content

Sunner, Sohail

CPSO#: 94357

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Dosanjh, Sohail (used until: 14 Feb 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 16
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 792-0100
Fax: (905) 792-0190 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Park Family Medicine
10-2710 North Park Dr
Brampton ON  L6S 0E9
Canada
Phone: 905-799-0777
Fax: 905-799-0187
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sohail Sunner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sunner ( CPSO# 94357 )

Business Address:
Unit 16
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-0100

Business Address:
2 - 2956 Highway 69N
Val Caron ON  P3N 1E3
Phone Number: (905) 805-0198

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:28 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SOHAIL SUNNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2011