skip to content

Upadhye, Suneel

CPSO#: 70441

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Upadhye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Upadhye ( CPSO# 70441 )

Business Address:
10 Ewen Road
Hamilton ON  L8S 3C4
Phone Number: (905) 540-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2020
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2021
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2021 Active
 As from January 15, 2021, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Suneel Upadhye: 

(i)	Dr. Upadhye shall comply with the College Policy "Closing a Medical Practice". 
(ii)	Dr. Upadhye will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification.  Dr. Upadhye will complete the PROBE program within six (6) months of the date of this Order, and will provide proof to the College of his completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it.
(iii)	Dr. Upadhye will provide proof of satisfactory completion of the University of Toronto Medical Record-Keeping Course upon the earlier of: (a) within six (6) months of the date of this Order; and (b) within 30 days of receipt of evidence of Dr. Upadhye's completion of the Course from the University of Toronto.  
Clinical Supervision
(iv)	Prior to resuming practice following the suspension of his certificate of registration described above in paragraph 3, Dr. Upadhye shall retain, at his own expense, a College-approved clinical supervisor, who will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Clinical Supervisor");  
(v)	For a period of six (6) months commencing on the date Dr. Upadhye resumes practice following the suspension of his certificate of registration described above in paragraph 3, Dr. Upadhye may practice only under the supervision of the Clinical Supervisor, who shall facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached hereto as Schedule "B" ("Clinical Supervision"), and as follows.   
(vi)	Clinical Supervision of Dr. Upadhye's practice shall contain the following elements:
a)	An initial meeting with Dr. Upadhye to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;
b)	The Clinical Supervision will be six (6) months in duration and consist of monthly meetings.  At each meeting, the Clinical Supervisor will:
1.	 Review a minimum of 15 patient charts, selected in the sole discretion of the Clinical Supervisor in accordance with the education needs in the IEP attached hereto as Schedule "B", to assess quality of documentation and care; and
2.	Directly observe a minimum of three (3) of Dr. Upadhye's patient encounters with patients receiving injections for chronic pain, subject to the following: after three (3) months of Clinical Supervision, if recommended by the Clinical Supervisor and approved by the College, direct observation of patient encounters will not be required for the remaining three (3) months of Clinical Supervision. 
c)	The Clinical Supervisor shall discuss with Dr. Upadhye any concerns the Clinical Supervisor may have arising from the chart reviews and/or direct observation;
d)	The Clinical Supervisor will make recommendations to Dr. Upadhye for practice improvements and ongoing professional development, and inquire into Dr. Upadhye's compliance with the recommendations;
e)	The Clinical Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient identifiers; and
f)	The Clinical Supervisor will provide a report to the College at the end of every two (2) months of Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about Dr. Upadhye's standard of practice or conduct or that Dr. Upadhye's patients may be exposed to harm or injury.
(vii)	Dr. Upadhye shall fully cooperate with the Clinical Supervision and shall abide by the recommendations of the Clinical Supervisor.
(viii)	If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking as set out in Schedule "A" to this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Upadhye shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.
(ix)	If Dr. Upadhye is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance with this Order, he shall cease to practice medicine until such time as he has done so.
(x)	If Dr. Upadhye is required to cease to practice medicine as a result of section 4(ix) above, this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.
(xi)	Dr. Upadhye shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor to the College, and by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, of all information the Clinical Supervisor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and Dr. Upadhye's compliance with this Order.
Reassessment
(xii)	Approximately three (3) months after the completion of the PROBE program, Medical Record-Keeping Course, and the period of Clinical Supervision, each as set out above, Dr. Upadhye shall, at his own expense, undergo a re-assessment by a College-appointed assessor (the "Assessor(s)").  The Reassessment shall include a review of at least 15 patient charts and direct observation of Dr. Upadhye's practice, and may also include interviews with Dr. Upadhye, his colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.  The Assessor(s) shall submit a written report on the results of the Reassessment to the College.
(xiii)	Dr. Upadhye shall cooperate fully with the Reassessment and with the Assessor(s).  Dr. Upadhye shall consent to the disclosure to the Assessor(s) of the reports of the Clinical Supervisor arising from the supervision, and shall consent to the sharing of all information between the Clinical Supervisor, the Assessor(s) and the College, as the College deems necessary or desirable.
Monitoring
(xiv)	Dr. Upadhye shall inform the College of each and every location where he practices including but not limited to hospitals, clinics and offices, in any jurisdiction (collectively his "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of the date he resumes practice following the suspension of his certificate of registration described in paragraph 3 above, and shall inform the College of any new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location, for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with this Order;
(xv)	Dr. Upadhye shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice, patient charts and Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") claims submissions by a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order.
(xvi)	Dr. Upadhye shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of the OHIP and/or any person or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor and enforce his compliance with the terms of this Order.  Dr. Upadhye shall promptly sign such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information from these persons or institutions.
Costs of Order
(xvii)	Dr. Upadhye shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing this Order.






Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Jan 2021
Summary:

On February 7, 2020, allegations of Dr. Upadhye’s professional misconduct were 
 referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that Dr. Upadhye 
 engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and failed to maintain 
 the standard of practice of the profession. 
 
The matter was heard on January 15, 2021 by way of videoconference in the presence 
of counsel for the College, Dr. Upadhye, and counsel for Dr. Upadhye. On the basis of an 
Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability), the Committee found that Dr. 
Upadhye committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional; and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession in his care and treatment of patients. 
 
Disposition 
 
On January 18, 2021, the Discipline Committee issued its Order directing that: 

   •  Dr. Upadhye attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
    •  The Registrar suspend Dr. Upadhye’s certificate of registration for four months 
       commencing Feb. 1, 2021 
    •  The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Upadhye’s certificate 
       of registration, as set out in the Order 
    •  Dr. Upadhye pay costs to the College in the amount of $6000.00 
  
 The Committee’s full reasons for decision were released on April 9, 2021 and are 
 available for review on the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): January 15, 2021

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective December 19, 2017.
Download Full Document (PDF)