skip to content

Sun, Yuan

CPSO#: 98048

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
Hospitalist Office
1245 Lakeshore Rd.
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Fax: (905) 681-4964 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yuan Sun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Sun ( CPSO# 98048 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Hospitalist Office
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YUAN SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014