skip to content

Sun, Dongmei

CPSO#: 87160

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 57034
Fax: (888) 789-6130 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dongmei Sun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sun ( CPSO# 87160 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
E6-308A
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONGMEI SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 15 Dec 2009 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 15 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Apr 2013
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2011