skip to content

Sun, Charles Young

CPSO#: 25396

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2012