skip to content

Sun, Cathy Juemeng

CPSO#: 100617

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital RiversideCampus
4th floor Endocrinology
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81950
Fax: (613) 738-8396 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHY JUEMENG SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2018