skip to content

Summers, Alexander Timothy

CPSO#: 100302

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 King St
London ON  N6A 5L7
Phone: (519) 663-5317 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER TIMOTHY SUMMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUMMERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015