Summerfield, Jessica Katherine (CPSO#: 98753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
1275 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone: (519) 253-9116
Fax: 5192535404
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jessica Summerfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Summerfield ( CPSO# 98753 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
WRH-Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
Unit 2
1275 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 253-9116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA KATHERINE SUMMERFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUMMERFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015