skip to content

Sum, Denise Abby

CPSO#: 93536

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Birchmount Rd. Unit 3E
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2563
Fax: 416-495-2426 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Denise Sum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sum ( CPSO# 93536 )

Business Address:
Unit 3E
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2563

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DENISE ABBY SUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015