skip to content

Sultan, Meshal Abdulkarim

CPSO#: 94918

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2011 to 23 Jun 2011
PEAP - R - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2017