Sullovey, Amanda Joy (CPSO#: 91440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M4 Clinic M4 138
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5367
Fax: (416) 480-5616
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA JOY SULLOVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLOVEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012