skip to content

Sullivan, Sean Thomas

CPSO#: 98151

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Barrydowne Road
Suite 105
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone: (705) 524-7312
Fax: (705) 524-7897 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury, ON
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

111 Larch Street, Suite 400
Sudbury, ON
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T5
Canada
Phone: (705) 688-0500
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

1485 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1R6
Canada
Fax: (705)-222-3372
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sean Thomas Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sullivan ( CPSO# 98151 )

Business Address:
Room 105
555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone Number: (705) 524-7312

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
1485 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1R6

Business Address:
Suite 400
111 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T5
Phone Number: (705) 688-0500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEAN THOMAS SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014