skip to content

Suleman, Shazeen

CPSO#: 98384

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
2Nd Floor
61 Queen St E
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins And District Hospital
700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (416) 802-3545
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Suleman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAZEEN SULEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2016