skip to content

Sukhai, Natasha Preya

CPSO#: 84608

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: (416) 747-3611 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Sukhai & V. Kapila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kapila ( CPSO# 84385 )
Dr. N. Sukhai ( CPSO# 84608 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
Suite 105
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 497-2255

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATASHA PREYA SUKHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKHAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009