skip to content

Suke, Ralph

CPSO#: 32013

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1980

Summary

Former Name: Suk, Ralph (used until: 18 Jun 1984 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ralph Suke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 7 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: RR2 319055 Grey Road 1 Kemble ON N0H 1S0 Tel: 1-519-371-8789
Date Received: 22 Mar 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RALPH SUKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1980