skip to content

Sujana Kumar, Vidya

CPSO#: 95325

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: (416) 495-2420 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

SHN Centenary Hospital
Obstetrical Medicine Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-281-7425
Fax: 416-281-7306
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIDYA SUJANA KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUJANA KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2017 to 12 Apr 2018
CF - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016