Suhool, Amal Abdulla (CPSO#: 99803)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 14 Jan 2013 to 27 Jan 2013
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Jan 2013 to 01 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2013