skip to content

Suh, Nina

CPSO#: 86566

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Room D0-215
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6050
Fax: (519) 646-6049 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nina Suh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Suh ( CPSO# 86566 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Room D0-215
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6050


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NINA SUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2014