skip to content

Suh, Matthew Chung Kuee

CPSO#: 31835

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Seoul National University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Matthew Chung Kuee Suh to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 6, 2018:

Dr. Suh was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and sexual abuse with respect to one patient. After the allegations were referred to the Discipline Committee and prior to the hearing, Dr. Suh resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)