skip to content

Suh, Daniel

CPSO#: 89899

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nottingham, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uxbridge Health Centre
2 Elgin Park Drive
Unit B
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone: (905) 852-1009
Fax: (905) 852-3531 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Campus
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7404
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416-438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Suh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Suh ( CPSO# 89899 )

Business Address:
Uxbridge Health Centre
Unit B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:10 Aug 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL SUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 06 Oct 2008 to 28 Dec 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 29 Dec 2008 to 05 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 05 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2010