skip to content

Sugar, Linda Marilyn

CPSO#: 30441

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4120 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Sugar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sugar ( CPSO# 30441 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective:03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDA MARILYN SUGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUGAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1978