skip to content

Sue-Chue-Lam, Jerry

CPSO#: 28934

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jerry Sue-Chue-Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:17 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2016