skip to content

Sudarsky, Merav Tova

CPSO#: 97298

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 09 Feb 2012 to 03 May 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 May 2012 to 31 May 2012
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2012