skip to content

Sud, Maneesh Kumar

CPSO#: 95118

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D410
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89792 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maneesh Kumar Sud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sud ( CPSO# 95118 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Scicnes Centre
Room D410
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANEESH KUMAR SUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015