skip to content

Sud, Abhimanyu

CPSO#: 90931

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B2V2
Phone: (905) 281-9898
Fax: 905-281-9143 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Abhimanyu Sud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sud ( CPSO# 90931 )

Business Address:
312 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 281-9898

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABHIMANYU SUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011