skip to content

Subramanian, Thangamani

CPSO#: 31821

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
15 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Barbora Pek 1309 Main Street West Hamilton ON L8S 1C5 Tel: 905-529-6560
Date Received: 04 Nov 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 2021