skip to content

Subramanian, Priya

CPSO#: 90102

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PEPP Program LHSC Victoria Hospital
P O Box 5010, Station B
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6662
Fax: (519) 667-6689 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Priya Subramanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Subramanian ( CPSO# 90102 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
P.O. Box 5010, Station B
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite A632
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6662


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:12 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 02 Jan 2009 to 16 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

Western University, 17 Feb 2009 to 16 Feb 2010
CF - Psychiatry

Western University, 17 Feb 2010 to 11 Mar 2010
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016 Active
             Dr. Priya Subramanian may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.