skip to content

Su, Kaiyan

CPSO#: 101156

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eastdale Medical Clinic
997 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON  M4M 1Z4
Phone: 647-348-6880
Fax: 647-348-8122 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pacific Medical Clinic
4300 Steeles Ave E F33
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Canada
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3333 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1V 2J7
Canada
Phone: (416) 412-3333
Fax: (416) 412-6200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kaiyan Su Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Su ( CPSO# 101156)

Business Address:
Eastdale Medical Clinic
997 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1Z4
Phone Number: (647) 348-6880

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAIYAN SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015