skip to content

Sturm, Harold

CPSO#: 31295

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University Of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
441 Clark Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W8
Phone: (905) 764-5114
Fax: 9057649615 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 217
1920 Weston Road
Weston ON  M9N1W2
Canada
Phone: 4162458583
Fax: 9057649615
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Harold Sturm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sturm ( CPSO# 31295 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
441 Clark Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W8
Phone Number: (905) 764-5114

Business Address:
Suite 202
1920 Weston Road
Weston ON  M9N 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 245-8583

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAROLD STURM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STURM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018