skip to content

Sturgeon, Jeremy Ferdinand George

CPSO#: 22131

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 416 946 2000 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEREMY FERDINAND GEORGE STURGEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STURGEON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1969