skip to content

Stubbs, Peter John Stronach

CPSO#: 97476

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hosp
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: (519) 842-6733 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Aberfoyle Crescent SPH 6
Toronto ON  M8X 2X8
Canada
Phone: (647) 226-3721
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter John S. Stubbs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Stubbs ( CPSO# 97476 )

Business Address:
101 - 50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (866) 348-6890

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Business Address:
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Business Address:
1413 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone Number: (905) 278-8000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:03 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active
 Dr. Peter John Stronach Stubbs may practise medicine independently in
            anaesthesiology, excluding ASA-IV and ASA-V patients, only.