skip to content

Stubbins, Robert Arthur

CPSO#: 15125

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 15-Sep-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Stubbins medical records are being stored at: 3 Simcoe Street Penetanguishene, ON L9M 1V2 Tel: (705) 549-3153
Date Received: 10 Aug 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2011